Yim, Annabella Chi-Ka (CPSO#: 79232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4600 Ext. 5912
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annabella Yim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yim ( CPSO# 79232 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Diagnostic Imaging
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNABELLA CHI-KA YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2009 to 15 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010