Young, Elizabeth Yuen Fun (CPSO#: 77617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ISAND clinic
Suite 500
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416-224-5959
Fax: 416-224-2772
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Y. F. Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Young ( CPSO# 77617 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YUEN FUN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006