Yu, Jinwoo Robert (CPSO#: 72543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 5614
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yu ( CPSO# 72543 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JINWOO ROBERT YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003