Yu, Katie (CPSO#: 90920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 22
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 595-2012
Fax: (905) 595-2013
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Room N5-794
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATIE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011