Yu, Yeyao (CPSO#: 95377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Rd
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: 519-601-8621
Fax: 519-204-3122
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
B10-118
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8078
Fax: 519-685-8096
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
B10-118
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8078
Fax: 519-685-8096
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yeyao Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yu ( CPSO# 95377 )

Business Address:
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621

Business Address:
E5-800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8078

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEYAO YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016