Yuen, Jasper See Yin (CPSO#: 81672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jasper Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuen ( CPSO# 81672 )
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 80948 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100


Corporation Name: Darana Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuen ( CPSO# 81672 )
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 80948 )

Business Address:
EyeMD Institute
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 456-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASPER SEE YIN YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009