Zaarour, Christian Elias (CPSO#: 75937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Lebanese University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian E. Zaarour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zaarour ( CPSO# 75937 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Apr 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Christian Elias Zaarour may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
            only.