Zahanova, Stacy (CPSO#: 97823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahanova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zahanova ( CPSO# 97823 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatric Endocrinology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACY ZAHANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHANOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018