Zai, Gwyneth Ching Mung (CPSO#: 88883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH College Street Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 979-4666
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gwyneth Zai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zai ( CPSO# 88883 )

Business Address:
CAMH College Street Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GWYNETH CHING MUNG ZAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013