Zarrabian, Mohammad Mehdy (CPSO#: 89079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
AD420-820 Sherbrook St
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: 204-787-4776
Fax: 204-787-2460
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3225 Lawrence Ave E
Toronto ON  M1H 3C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-3848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Mehdy Zarrabian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD MEHDY ZARRABIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARRABIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2012 to 19 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015