Zavagnin, Nicole Jacqueline (CPSO#: 91246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 N Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7758
Fax: (807) 346-6209
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Zavagnin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Zavagnin ( CPSO# 91246 )

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1

Business Address:
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE JACQUELINE ZAVAGNIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVAGNIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011