Zayed, Rim Medhat Mahmoud (CPSO#: 89309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2018

Expiry Date:  18 Apr 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7 International Dr
Pembroke ON  K8A 6W5
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
450 O'Brien Rd
Renfrew ON  K7V 3Z2
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 19 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2011 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 08 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Apr 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Rim  Medhat  Mahmoud Zayed may practise public health and preventive
                  medicine with Renfrew  County  and  District  Health Unit in Pembroke and
                  Renfrew,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated  by  a  supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Zayed's  eligibility  to  take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Zayed's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College by  the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Zayed's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April 19, 2018, and will expire on  or
                  before April 18, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.