Zeller, Michelle Paula (CPSO#: 86700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
H S C 3H54
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Zeller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zeller ( CPSO# 86700 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
HSC 3V51B
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone Number: (905) 304-7467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE PAULA ZELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012