Zhou, Tianle (CPSO#: 93172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416 360 4000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tianle Zhou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zhou ( CPSO# 93172 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIANLE ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015