Ziada, Zeinab Hamdy (CPSO#: 92249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ziada ( CPSO# 92249 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Suite A10-202
London ON  N6A 5A5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEINAB HAMDY ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012