Zimbalatti, Carol Ann (CPSO#: 81299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Dr.
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 4748600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Zimbalatti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zimbalatti ( CPSO# 81299 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANN ZIMBALATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMBALATTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007