de Laplante, Stefan Pierre Roger (CPSO#: 95911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Academic FHT
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Public Health
Sexual Health Center
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Canada
Phone: (613) 234-4641
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefan de Laplante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Laplante ( CPSO# 95911 )

Business Address:
Hospital Montfort
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Montfort Academic Family Health
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Business Address:
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN PIERRE ROGER DE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013