de Mestral, Charles William Armand (CPSO#: 88888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing 7-080
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5459
Fax: 416-864-6012
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles de Mestral Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Mestral ( CPSO# 88888 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Bond Wing 7-080
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5459

Business Address:
G1-06 - 2075 Bayview
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES WILLIAM ARMAND DE MESTRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MESTRAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017