de Metz, Catherine Ellen (CPSO#: 57842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of
South Eastern Ontario
at Kingston Health Sciences Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Catherine de Metz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario at
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELLEN DE METZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE METZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Mar 1987
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1998