della Zazzera, Vincent (CPSO#: 89310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Medical Group
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Fax: 613-830-1901
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Devision of Maternal Fetal Medicine
Riverside Campus
Women's Health 7th Floor.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Montfort Hospital
Department of Uro-Gynecology
713 Montreal Rd.
Out patient clinic 1D
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4307
Fax: 613-748-4958
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent della Zazzera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. della Zazzera ( CPSO# 89310 )

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (343) 999-7232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT DELLA ZAZZERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELLA ZAZZERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013