el Helou, Salhab (CPSO#: 92597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73490
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. el Helou ( CPSO# 92597 )
Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou ( CPSO# 99339 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Salhab el Helou may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Neonatology, McMaster University, in which
                        Dr. el Helou holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment. 
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. el Helou
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.