von Schlegell, Ahmad Shariff (CPSO#: 96697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rush Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5415
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 8131100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2460 Truscott Drive
Sheridan Villa Long Term Care
Mississauga ON  L5M 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-8668
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

425 Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 458-9272
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: As von Schlegell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. von Schlegell ( CPSO# 96697 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ahmad  Shariff  von  Schlegell  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            geriatric medicine and palliative care medicine, only.