skip to content

Annual Membership Renewal

Each year, registered physicians are required to submit their renewal application.

Print page icon

This information is for members with one of the following certificates of registration as of March 12, 2020:

  • Independent Practice
  • Restricted (excluding restricted for postgraduate education)
  • Academic Practice
  • Under serviced Area

Important Information for 2020

In acknowledgment of the difficult circumstances for all physicians in Ontario due to the COVID-19 pandemic, we have extended the 2020 Annual Renewal period by one month.  The deadline for renewing your membership is normally June 1st, however we have pushed that deadline to June 30th at 5 p.m. EDT.  We ask that all members please complete their renewal by then. (Prior invoices that display a June 1st due date may be disregarded.)

  • We email a renewal notice to all members with one of the above certificates on Monday, April 13, 2020.
  • All members must renew online — paper renewal forms are not available.
  • You may make the annual fee payment online or mail it separately.
  • Renewal form and fee are due by 5 p.m. EDT on Tuesday June 30, 2020

If you have any questions or need assistance, please email Physician Advisory Services, or call 416-967-2603 or 1-800-268-7096, ext. 603.

The College is offering options for those facing financial hardship as a result of COVID-19. Physicians have the option to defer payment until July 30th without a late fee. However, they must still complete the questionnaire portion of renewal by June 30th. Alternatively, CPSO has also launched a deferred payment plan for 2020. Please find details and instructions on how to sign up below.

Payment Plan

  • Step 1: Call or email PPAS to let us know that you would like to pay your annual membership dues using the COVID-19 Relief Payment Plan.
  • Step 2: Ensure that you have completed your 2020 Annual Renewal Survey.
  • Step 3: You will receive an email on July 1, 2020 with access details to the COVID-19 Relief Payment Portal and instructions on next steps.
  • Step 4: You will be required to log into the payment portal between July 1st-Sept 3rd, 2020 to sign in and complete your enrollment into the COVID-19 Payment Plan.
  • Step 5: Depending on when you enroll into the payment plan, you will be provided with installment options. Note, during enrollment you will require a valid credit card to pre-authorize payment installments.
Date Signed Into Payment Portal # of Payment  Installments Available Payment Installment  Amount Details
Jul 1st-Jul 31st, 2020 6 (maximum)
5
4
3
2
$287.50
$345.00
$431.25
$575.00
$862.50

e.g. $287.50 * 6 equal payments = $1725.00

Payment #1 = Made on date of initial enrollment

Subsequent Payments = Automatically charged every 30 days

Aug 1st-Aug 31st, 2020 5 (maximum)
4
3
2
$345.00
$431.25
$575.00
$862.50

e.g. $345.00 * 5 equal payments = $1725.00

Payment #1 = Made on date of initial enrollment

Subsequent Payments = Automatically charged every 30 days

Sept 1st-Sept 3rd, 2020 4 (maximum)
3
2
$431.25
$575.00
$862.50

e.g. $431.25 * 4 equal payments = $1725.00

Payment #1 = Made on date of initial enrollment

Subsequent Payments = Automatically charged every 30 days

 

Membership

The CPSO’s membership year runs from June 1 to May 31. A physician becomes a member of the College when issued a certificate of registration authorizing you to practice medicine in Ontario. You retain your certificate by fully completing the online form and submitting payment annually. Your new membership certificate and annual fee receipt is available in the members’ portal on the College’s website.

Every member is responsible for ensuring the CPSO has your current mailing and email addresses, and updating your online profile with any changes within 30 days.

Annual Membership Fee

The 2020 annual membership fee is $1,725. This is the second consecutive year we have not raised fees and instead have been able to accommodate inflationary increases through internal efficiencies. Ontario’s fees remain among the lowest in Canada.

MRA 2019 2020
Alberta $1,960 $2,150
PEI $1,950 $1,950
Nova Scotia $1,950 $1,950
Saskatchewan $1,880 $1,880
NFLD & Labrador $1,850 $1,850
Manitoba $1,816 $1,870
Ontario $1,725 $1,725
British Columbia $1,700 $1,715
Quebec $1,595 $1,625
New Brunswick $600 $600

 

This year we have also removed service fees on the following items to reduce overall membership costs:

  • Certificates of Professional Conduct
  • Embassy Letters
  • Use of College Seal
  • Legal Name Change
  • Imaging Revenue
  • Data Sharing Cost Recovery
  • Return Cheque Admin. Charges

Suspension

A member may receive a notice of intention to suspend your certificate of registration in 60 days if you fail to complete the online renewal form or submit the fee payment. 

If a member’s certificate of registration is suspended, the Registrar will notify the member by mail at which time their registration expires and the former member is no longer authorized to practice medicine in Ontario.

In addition:

  • We add a permanent notation of suspension to the physician’s record and public profile.
  • We circulate a list containing the names of all suspended physicians to Ontario hospitals.

If a suspended physician wishes to resume practice in Ontario, they must submit an application for a new certificate of registration, pay all applicable fees, and meet all registration requirements in force at the time of application.